Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 32 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17835 Week
» 70851 Month
» 190378 Year
» 3217231 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8563 |
20/12/1963 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/12/1963 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/12/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8563 Built at Clayton Equipment Co. Ltd., Hatton, Derby Allocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
30/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
29/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
25/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
31/12/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8563 from Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
09/1975 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|