Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D86 09/03/1961
TOPS (Tops) 45105 04/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 45
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 09/03/1961
Withdrawn 10/05/1987
Time in Service 26 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 09/03/1961
82B St Philips Marsh w/e 08/07/1961
17A Derby w/e 02/09/1961
14A Cricklewood East w/e 13/01/1962
17A Derby w/e 03/03/1962
ML Line Power Controller, Derby 16/01/1965
D16 Nottingham Division 17/06/1968
   Withdrawn 10/05/1987

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/03/1961 To Service To service as D86
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
08/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
02/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
13/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
03/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
08/06/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Klondyke Sidings. SLS 7/1962 Link
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
04/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 45105    
10/05/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 45105    

prev prev