Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2687 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16093 Week
» 69109 Month
» 188636 Year
» 3215489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8610 |
07/12/1964 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/12/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/12/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8610 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 8027 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
05/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8610 |
|
|
08/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|