Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2732 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16138 Week
» 69154 Month
» 188681 Year
» 3215534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D862 |
13/03/1962 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
VIKING |
13/03/1962 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
43 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L100 |
Works Number |
27991 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
13/03/1962 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
03/10/1971 |
Time in Service |
9 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys |
Total Mileage |
727,000 miles |
Cut Up |
12/05/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/03/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
22/12/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D862, name: VIKING Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27991 Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
27/09/1969 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
24/01/1970 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
29/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 862 |
|
|
12/05/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|