Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 337 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18140 Week
» 71156 Month
» 190683 Year
» 3217536 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D866 |
24/03/1961 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
ZEBRA |
24/03/1961 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
42 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
448 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 1 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
24/03/1961 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
01/01/1972 off Newton Abbot (83A) |
Time in Service |
10 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,040,000 miles |
Cut Up |
13/10/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
09/12/1964 |
Unknown |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D866, name: ZEBRA Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 866 from Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
13/10/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|