Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 224 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 224 Week
» 11771 Month
» 411453 Year
» 488040 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D870 25/10/1961

Names Carried
Name Date From
ZULU 25/10/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 42
Wheels B-B
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 25/10/1961
Withdrawn 28/08/1971
Time in Service 9 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys
Total Mileage 922,000 miles
Cut Up 12/05/1972
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 25/10/1961
83A Newton Abbot 7w/e 19/06/1966
84A Laira 4w/e 31/08/1967
   Stored 6w/e 14/08/1971
   Withdrawn 28/08/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/10/1961 To Service To service as D870, name: ZULU
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
19/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
31/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
23/07/1969 Sightings Exeter St Davids station and depot: On Exeter St Davids depot. RO 10/1969 Link
14/08/1971 To Store To Store    
28/08/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D870    
09/01/1972 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Derelict shell RO 3/1972 Link
21/01/1972 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the works RO 3/1972 Link
12/05/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev