Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1391 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15434 Week
» 80388 Month
» 283052 Year
» 3309905 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
TOPS |
87001 |
01/06/1973 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
14/01/1976 |
STEPHENSON |
11/07/1977 |
ROYAL SCOT |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
87 |
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
01/06/1973 |
To Service At |
Willesden (WN) |
Withdrawn |
01/06/2005 |
Time in Service |
32 yrs |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
WN |
Willesden (New) |
on |
01/06/1973 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/06/2005 |
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
01/06/1973 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/06/1973 |
To Service |
|
|
|
14/01/1976 |
Naming |
Named 'STEPHENSON' by The Stephenson Locomotive Society at Euston Station |
|
|
11/07/1977 |
Naming |
Renamed 'ROYAL SCOT' at Euston Station |
|
|
01/06/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 87001 |
|
|