Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8702 |
m/e |
02/1931 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
83E |
St Blazey |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
ALLOC |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
4w/e |
27/01/1962 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
ALLOC |
86C |
Hereford |
4w/e |
06/04/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/05/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8702 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6682 |
|
|
07/03/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (86C) |
|
|
06/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8702 |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|