Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 817 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18620 Week
» 71636 Month
» 191163 Year
» 3218016 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8727 |
m/e |
12/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
W.G. Bagnall |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2424 |
To Service |
During 12/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/04/1962 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/03/1961 |
South Wales loans |
The following locomotives are on loan as follows-1607 to NCB Gwaun-cae-Gurwen, 1611 to C.E.G.B. Tir John, 1665 NCB Pantyfynnon, 3670 NCB Maerdy, 6435 NCB Penallta, 7414 Sir J. McAlpine, Gatewen, 8727 NCB Hafod, 8732 NCB Yriscedwyn, 8735 NCB Abercwmboi. |
SLS/196104 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8727 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2424 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kidderminster (KDR) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
02/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8727 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|