Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 403 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1788 Week
» 8593 Month
» 115539 Year
» 1337104 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8728 m/e 01/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder W.G. Bagnall
To Service During 01/1931
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Scrapping During 03/1964
Service Life 32 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 08/09/1962
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1963
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 22/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963
WDN   w/e 14/07/1963
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 22/07/1963
WDN   4w/e 27/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1931 To Service To service as GWR Number 8728    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 8728    
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    

prev prev