Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 483 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2598 Week
» 25104 Month
» 328294 Year
» 1549859 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 8750 on 29/09/1933

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 282
To Service Mon 29/09/1933
Withdrawal Mon 07/05/1962
Scrapping During 09/1962
Service Life 28 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 29/09/1933
81C Southall 4w/e 27/12/1952
87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 21/05/1960
   Withdrawn on 07/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 21/05/1960
WDN   m/e 31/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/09/1933 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8750
Built at Swindon Works
   
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
07/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 8750    

prev prev