Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 458 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 458 Week
» 22964 Month
» 326154 Year
» 1547719 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 8770 on 01/01/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 282
To Service Wed 01/01/1934
Withdrawal Wed 12/12/1962
Scrapping During 07/1963
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 01/01/1934
81B Slough 4w/e 13/08/1960
81C Southall 4w/e 25/03/1961
   Withdrawn on 12/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81B Slough 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 25/03/1961
WDN   on 12/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during January: 207/42/70, 1751/86, 2084, 2116, 2221/74, 2679, 2766, 2802/11/53/62/98, 2912/51, 3034, 3188, 3219/64, 3754, 3808/63, 4004/13/7/21, 4125, 4299, 4326, 4539/47/98, 4615, 4811/5/54, 4909/51/6/63/90, 5019/46/55/6/80, 5161, 5361, 5403, 5534/40/52/65, 5906/25/51/72/4/85, 6003/10/4/9/22/6, 6112, 6314/45/7/56, 6690, 6721, 6919/61/5, 7300/9, 7700/8, 7804, 8359, 8704/14/22/70, 9301, 9768/89/91, WD 71488, 75046. SLS/194604

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/01/1934 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8770
Built at Swindon Works
   
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Slough (81B)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
12/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 8770    

prev prev