Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 392 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1777 Week
» 8582 Month
» 115528 Year
» 1337093 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8776 m/e 01/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 01/1934
Withdrawal Tue 18/12/1962
Scrapping During 05/1963
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 30/04/1952
88C Barry 4w/e 08/09/1962
   Withdrawn 18/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABEEG Aberbeeg 4w/e 17/05/1947
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 08/09/1962
WDN   18/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1934 To Service To service as GWR Number 8776
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
18/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 8776    

prev prev