Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 413 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1798 Week
» 8603 Month
» 115549 Year
» 1337114 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8780 m/e 01/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 01/1934
Withdrawal During 07/1962
Scrapping During 06/1963
Service Life 28 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 21/02/1959
88A Radyr 4w/e 16/05/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PDN Old Oak Common 4w/e 17/05/1947
ALLOC RYR Radyr 4w/e 23/04/1949
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 16/05/1959
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1934 To Service To service as GWR Number 8780
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 8780    

prev prev