Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1503 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19306 Week
» 72322 Month
» 191849 Year
» 3218702 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8793 |
on |
02/03/1934 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
282 |
To Service |
Mon 02/03/1934 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/12/1964 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/03/1934 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8793 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) |
|
|
17/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F) |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
14/12/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8793 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|