|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering works during April included:- 2095, 2159, 2407, 2612, 2655, 2702, 2784, 2787, 2808, 2835, 2936, 2937, 2940, 2949, 2954, 2989, 3012, 3018, 3048, 3150, 3386, 3586, 3594, 4007, 4020, 4023, 4042, 4078, 4381, 4920, 4968, 4971, 5012, 5043, 5305, 5375, 5960, 5986, 6023, 6309, 6344, 6399, 6953, 6970, and L.M.S. 8465. Further 'Panniers' fitted with T.F. boilers are 3663, 8713, and 8794. Works' pilots during April included: 200, 207, 1542, 1795, 1796, 2723, 2773 and 3561. New engines reported are: 1029 PDN, 9404 PDN. | SLS/194706 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/03/1934 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 8794 Built at Swindon Works |
||
20/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberbeeg (ABEEG) | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Aberbeeg (ABEEG) | ||
24/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) | ||
11/08/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (87E) | ||
17/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
14/07/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
20/07/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 8794 | ||
10/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |