Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 611 Today
» 1259 Yesterday
» 1870 Week
» 24851 Month
» 388096 Year
» 464683 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D9 02/01/1960
TOPS (Tops) 44009 16/02/1974

Names Carried
Name Date From
SNOWDON 02/01/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 44
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Derby Works
To Service 02/01/1960
Withdrawn 01/03/1979
Time in Service 19 yrs, 1 mth , 27 dys
Cut Up 07/1980
Cut At Locomotive Works (Derby)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
1B Camden (New) 02/01/1960
17A Derby w/e 09/01/1960
1B Camden w/e 05/03/1960
8A Edge Hill w/e 21/05/1960
18A Toton w/e 03/03/1962
D16 Nottingham Division 16/01/1965
   Withdrawn 01/03/1979


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
02/01/1960 To Service To service as D9, name: SNOWDON
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Camden (1B)
   
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
05/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - New erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
03/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
08/06/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel Erecting shop. SLS 7/1962 Link
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
06/02/1972 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. RO 4/1972 Link
16/02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 44009    
01/03/1979 Withdrawn Condemned as 44009    
07/1980 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    

prev prev