Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 867 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14910 Week
» 79864 Month
» 282528 Year
» 3309381 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9001 |
23/02/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
55001 |
23/02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
ST. PADDY |
07/07/1961 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
30/03/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
26/07/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
29/03/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
26/03/1971 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1975 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/02/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
29/03/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
26/03/1971 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
14/09/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/02/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9001 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
07/07/1961 |
Naming |
Named 'ST PADDY' at Doncaster Works |
|
|
30/03/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
29/03/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
22/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
26/07/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
26/03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
23/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55001 |
|
|
06/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
05/01/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55001 |
|
|
23/02/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|