Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4196 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17602 Week
» 70618 Month
» 190145 Year
» 3216998 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9004 |
10/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
55004 |
01/05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
12/01/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/01/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
27/08/1971 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/01/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
27/08/1971 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9004 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
23/05/1964 |
Naming |
Named 'QUEENS OWN HIGHLANDER' at Inverness station |
|
|
12/01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/01/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
27/08/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
01/05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55004 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
28/10/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55004 from York (North) (YK) |
|
|
23/07/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|