Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1577 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14983 Week
» 67999 Month
» 187526 Year
» 3214379 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9008 |
07/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
55008 |
09/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
01/07/1967 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
52A |
|
Gateshead (New) |
on |
07/07/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
31/12/1981 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
17/05/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/10/1971 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/07/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
17/05/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/10/1971 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
02/01/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Not known |
|
|
18/02/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9008 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
30/09/1963 |
Naming |
Named 'THE GREEN HOWARDS' at Darlington station |
|
|
01/07/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
17/05/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
09/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55008 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
31/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55008 |
|
|
08/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|