Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D9009 21/07/1961
TOPS (Tops) 55009 26/01/1974

Names Carried
Name Date From
ALYCIDON 21/07/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 55
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 21/07/1961
Withdrawn 02/01/1982
Time in Service 20 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 21/07/1961
64B Haymarket w/e 02/12/1967
34G Finsbury Park w/e 22/06/1968
   Withdrawn 02/01/1982

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/07/1961 To Service To service as D9009, name: ALYCIDON
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
02/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
22/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
26/01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 55009    
02/01/1982 Withdrawn Condemned as 55009    

prev prev