Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3915 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13489 Week
» 78443 Month
» 281107 Year
» 3307960 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9015 |
13/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
55015 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
TULYAR |
13/10/1961 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
55 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
2920/D572 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 2 | Multiple Fitting | Not fitted |
|
To Service |
13/10/1961 to Finsbury Park (34G) |
Withdrawn |
02/01/1982 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/02/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/05/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front, white window surrounds |
12/07/1979 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
34G |
|
Finsbury Park (New) |
on |
13/10/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/01/1982 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
22/02/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
13/02/1971 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/10/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
22/02/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
13/02/1971 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
20/03/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
18/08/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9015, name: TULYAR Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2920 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/02/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
22/02/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/05/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
13/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55015 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
12/07/1979 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front, white window surrounds |
|
|
02/01/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55015 |
|
|