Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 62 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17865 Week
» 70881 Month
» 190408 Year
» 3217261 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9017 |
09/11/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
55017 |
09/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
55 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
2922/D574 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 2 | Multiple Fitting | Not fitted |
|
To Service |
09/11/1961 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
31/12/1981 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys |
Cut Up |
29/01/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
27/04/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
04/10/1969 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
52A |
|
Gateshead (New) |
on |
09/11/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
31/12/1981 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/05/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
21/05/1971 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/11/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/05/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
21/05/1971 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9017 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2922 Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
29/10/1963 |
Naming |
Named 'THE DURHAM LIGHT INFANTRY' at Durham station |
|
|
27/04/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
08/05/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/10/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
21/05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
09/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55017 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
31/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55017 |
|
|
29/01/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|