Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2623 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16029 Week
» 69045 Month
» 188572 Year
» 3215425 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9018 |
24/11/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
55018 |
09/02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
BALLYMOSS |
24/11/1961 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
15/02/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
10/05/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front, white window surrounds |
14/08/1979 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/03/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
23/02/1971 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1975 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
11/10/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/11/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/03/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
23/02/1971 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
11/10/1981 |
xei |
Dual brakes, Dual heat, boiler isolated |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
04/06/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9018, name: BALLYMOSS Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2923 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
15/02/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
07/03/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
23/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
09/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55018 |
|
|
03/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
14/08/1979 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front, white window surrounds |
|
|
11/10/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
13/10/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55018 from York (North) (YK) |
|
|
01/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|