Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3810 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13384 Week
» 78338 Month
» 281002 Year
» 3307855 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9021 |
16/03/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
55021 |
02/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
06/12/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/12/1967 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
19/09/1970 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/03/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/12/1967 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
19/09/1970 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9021 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
29/11/1963 |
Naming |
Named 'ARGYLL & SUTHERLAND HIGHLANDER' at Stirling station |
|
|
12/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
06/12/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/12/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
19/09/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55021 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
31/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55021 |
|
|
18/09/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|