Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4159 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17565 Week
» 70581 Month
» 190108 Year
» 3216961 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92000 |
on |
05/01/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/01/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92000 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
02/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92000 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|