Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1034 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18837 Week
» 71853 Month
» 191380 Year
» 3218233 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92006 |
on |
10/02/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/10/1958 |
Newport Ebbw Junc. |
92237-40 from Pontypool Road are now here with 92241-4 (intended for Severn Tunnel Junc.). They work to Old Oak Common and also to Woodford (GC) via SMJ line. 92006 is stored. |
SLS/195812 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/02/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92006 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
08/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
10/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92006 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|