05/03/1961 |
Crewe Works (Works Sidings) |
Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. |
SLS/196104 |
21/03/1965 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: D1675-D1681, D1842-D1850, 44685/91, 44717/77, 45347, 45446, 45589, 48151/208/423/557, 70002/9/17/41, 77014, 78028, 92009/76, D5702/3, D8064, D204/20/8/55/68/91, D375/99, D1506/9/16/9/26, D1684/6; Traverser area: D258, D317/28/72, D1521/5/82, D1689, D1717, E27004, 48170/312/615, 92013; Waiting Works: D324, D1517/50, 44800, 44829, 44905, 45006/327, 48077/124/97/364/87/93/433/632/49/66, 70032, 92017; Electric shop: E26015/44, E3011/5/6/20/2/56; Paint shop: D1669/70/1/3/4, D8004/54, E3007, 71000 (Stored); Outside: 44807, 45303, 48470, 48646, 92107, 92133, 92205, D213, D1510/39/76, D8037/49. Also noted: D2708/11/22/41/2/3 an D1734 ex Salop accident. |
SLS/196505 |
08/05/1966 |
Crewe Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: 45025/39/145/198, 45375, 48620, 75016, 92009/110/60, D1100-7, D1557/60, D1709/11/21/2/42/7/52, D203, D253/4, D279, D317/21/5/41, E5016; Paint shop: 45294, 45455, 70010/22, 46235, 71000 stored, D1635, D1996/8/9, D5232, D5709; Electric and adjacent shop: D221, D257, D276, D1507/12, D1844/8, D5196, D5223/9/33, D5243, D7582, E3031/7/42/67, 26021; Old cutting up shop: E3045, D1534/75, D1889, D5704, D8045; Side of Works: 45395, 92048/163, D5702/10; Traverser area: D310/20/37/55/79, D1515/90, D1603/6, D1708/14/8, D1897, D1997, 26048, 92052. |
SLS/196606 |
11/12/1966 |
Crewe Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop-44672, 45092, 70013/4, 90243/81/300, 92009/203/220, 60007/10, D319, D339, D1111, D1585, D1607/15/21/2/3/9, D1701/28/39/67/77/8/85/8/93, D8005, E3014/6/22/3/6/34/5/45, E26038/52, E27003/6, E5015/6. Paint shop area-44665/889, 90081/362, E3001/15/36, D239, D375, D1107/8/10, D1523, D1662, D1954, D5709. Diesel shop-D214/24, D364/81. D1509/15/21/4/35, D1600/56, D1700, D1842, D1901/49/81, D5718. Electric shop-E26029/50, E3171, D1618. Test area-D1109, D1691, D1864, D5717. Traverser area-D322, D251, D1722/89, D1860, D1942, E3002/29, D5715, 60026, 71000, 90664. Old cutting up shop-D5704. Side of Works-70017, 45138, 90345/406, E3089, D5710. |
SLS/196701 |
08/01/1967 |
Crewe Works (Old Paint shop) |
Erecting shop-60007/10, 70013, 92220, D293, D388, D1505/7/23/92, D1622/30, D1728/56/74/81/91/7/8, D1805/37, D5711, D8005/43, E3001/2/14/6/22/3/6/9/45/6/68, E3100/99, E5023, E5015(E6101), E5016 (E6102), E5006(E6103). Old Paint shop-D249, D1102/9/10/1/5/94, D5709, D8061, E3064, E5019, 92009. Side of Works-D5710/3, 90243/81. Traverser area-D233, D1525, D1619, D1751, D1977, D5715, D8017, 60026, 71000. New shop-D251, D284, D332, D346, D364, D366, D1513/68/79, D1617, D1750, D1925/43. Electric shop-E3171, E26050. New Paint shop: D1621/9, D1758/77. No sign of E5024-the conversions appear to be having completely new bodies apart from cabs and are somewhat lengthened in appearance. |
SLS/196702 |
16/02/1968 |
CarnforthMPD (In steam) |
Stored LMS 6441, 70013 (sheeted). In steam: 92009/77/88/118/67 Out of use: 44887/9, 45092/259, 48757, 70021, 75009/15/20/21/24/33/34/43/48/62, 92110/212. 92004 & Type 2 D.E. hauled 12.00 Heysham-Neville Hill oil tanks, and 44894 headed south with another tank train from the Barrow line at 11.00 hrs. |
SLS/196803 |