|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/01/1965 | Crewe Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop: D1661-71, D1672-7 bodies, D225, D267, D299, D335, D1502/10/21/35/68/9, D1604/7, D1724/44, D5710, D6854, D8048, 42141/252/468/699, 44682/773/841/965, 48163/8/204/327/612/77/97/739, 70008/15/23/42/5, 92015/93/167/9. Outside: D1653/60, D1515, D1701, D229, 44684, 48315/751, 92002. Side of Works: 44691/717, 45300, 70022/35, 48035/322/423. Paint shop: E3704, 71000 stored, D236, D347, D1655/6/9, D5714. Outside: D1654/7/8, D1756, D5700, D6853, D8060, E3018, 45193, 48212, 78041, 92047/132/9. Traverser area: 44778, D233, D382, D1511/30, D1688, D5703, D7594, D8036/42/61. | SLS/196503 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/09/1954 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 92015 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
||
28/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
12/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
15/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bolton (26C) | ||
22/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
27/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
29/04/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 92015 | ||
11/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |