Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 56 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 3877 Week
» 21213 Month
» 299009 Year
» 1183390 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92038   14/12/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sun 14/12/1954 to New England (35A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 11/04/1965
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 10 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
35A New England (New) 14/12/1954
40B Immingham w/e 22/06/1963
34E New England w/e 20/06/1964
41J Langwith Junction w/e 09/01/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 11/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 35A New England 14/12/1954
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 34E New England 3w/e 04/07/1964
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 6w/e 09/01/1965
WDN   w/e 11/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/12/1954 To Service To service as BR Number 92038
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92038    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev