Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 708 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4529 Week
» 21865 Month
» 299661 Year
» 1184042 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92040   23/12/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sun 23/12/1954 to New England (35A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 08/08/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 10 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
35A New England (New) 23/12/1954
40E Colwick w/e 15/06/1963
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 12/09/1964
41J Langwith Junction w/e 09/01/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 08/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 35A New England 23/12/1954
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 6w/e 09/01/1965
WDN   w/e 08/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/12/1954 To Service To service as BR Number 92040
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
15/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92040    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev