Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 565 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18368 Week
» 71384 Month
» 190911 Year
» 3217764 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92058 |
on |
31/10/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/10/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92058 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
25/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
13/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
17/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92058 |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|