25/06/1961 |
Crewe Works (Works Sidings) |
Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. |
SLS/196108 |
23/07/1961 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. |
SLS/196109 |
04/02/1962 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through £50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. |
SLS/196203 |
27/03/1966 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 44659, 45132, 46443, 48392, 70038, 75009, 76040, 92002/16/77/123/227, D209, D290/9, D307/9/20, D1100-6, D1554/6/62/5, D1712/31, D1750, D1998/9, D8025. Traverser area: D215/9/34/53/72, D300/35/79, D1507/53/63/95/6, D1601/10, D1720, D1906, 26042, E3041/9, 92093. Old Cutting up shop: D233, D1537, D1859, D5704, E3045. Electric Shop: E3037/67/168, 26013/31. Test Area: D343, D5277, D7568. New shop: D305, D1505/15/24/41, D1617, D5227/31, D7554, E3031. Paint shop: 45135/305, 46235, 70003, 71000, 92026, D1993-7, D5709, D8010, 26034/57. Stored or waiting works: 44890, 45374/99, 45600, 47681, 48555, 48762, 78034. |
SLS/196605 |
16/02/1968 |
CarnforthMPD (In steam) |
Stored LMS 6441, 70013 (sheeted). In steam: 92009/77/88/118/67 Out of use: 44887/9, 45092/259, 48757, 70021, 75009/15/20/21/24/33/34/43/48/62, 92110/212. 92004 & Type 2 D.E. hauled 12.00 Heysham-Neville Hill oil tanks, and 44894 headed south with another tank train from the Barrow line at 11.00 hrs. |
SLS/196803 |