Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1208 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19011 Week
» 72027 Month
» 191554 Year
» 3218407 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92101 |
on |
31/08/1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92101 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92101 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport |
|
|