Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1189 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18992 Week
» 72008 Month
» 191535 Year
» 3218388 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92122 |
on |
28/02/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/02/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92122 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92122 from Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|