Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3763 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13337 Week
» 78291 Month
» 280955 Year
» 3307808 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92131 |
on |
31/05/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/05/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92131 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
16/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
05/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
15/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
23/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92131 |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|