Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 74 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 16636 Month
» 348125 Year
» 424712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92134   30/06/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Wed 30/06/1957 to Saltley (21A)
Withdrawal During 12/1966
Service Life 9 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
21A Saltley (New) 30/06/1957
15A Wellingborough 4w/e 28/12/1957
15A Leicester Midland w/e 15/02/1964
8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 10/04/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 21A Saltley w/e 25/05/1957
NEW 21A Saltley 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 15A Leicester Midland 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 10/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Preservation Date 09/12/1980
Current Status Under Restoration/Overhaul
Information Sole surviving single-chimney 9F. Currently under restoration at The Railway Age in Crewe.
Link www.cvr-extra.wanadoo.co.uk/92134.htm
Status Date 23/06/2011


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/06/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 92134
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Saltley (21A)
   
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
15/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A)    
10/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 92134    

prev prev