Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2887 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16293 Week
» 69309 Month
» 188836 Year
» 3215689 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92138 |
on |
31/07/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8C |
Speke Junction |
5w/e |
10/09/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/07/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/07/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92138 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
08/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92138 |
|
|
12/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|