Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1488 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19291 Week
» 72307 Month
» 191834 Year
» 3218687 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92140 |
on |
31/07/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
6w/e |
09/01/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/04/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/08/1957 |
B.R. Class 9F |
These can now be observed on passenger turns, e.g. : on 3rd August 92048 (21A) was booked to work as far as Bristol with a Leicester - Paignton train on same day 92121 (15C) worked a stopping train Leicester - Kettering - Bedford owing to failure of 45137 (15D). On 10th August 92057 (18A) worked a Birmingham - Leicester express. The latest 9F's ex Crewe (92140/1/2/3) are all allocated to New England. The Lickey banker, 92079, is under repair at Saltley. |
SLS/195709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/07/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92140 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
11/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92140 |
|
|
07/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|