Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 236 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 236 Week
» 17572 Month
» 295368 Year
» 1179749 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92141   31/12/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sun 31/12/1957
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/12/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 7 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
36A Doncaster w/e 29/09/1962
34E New England w/e 09/03/1963
41J Langwith Junction w/e 09/01/1965
40E Colwick w/e 06/11/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 19/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 35A New England 29/07/1957
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 34E New England 5w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 6w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   w/e 19/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 92141
Built at Crewe Works
   
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92141    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev