Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 114 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1039 Week
» 18375 Month
» 296171 Year
» 1180552 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92146   31/08/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sun 31/08/1957 to New England (35A)
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966
Scrapping During 06/1966 at W George, Station Steel (Wath)
Service Life 8 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
35A New England (New) 31/08/1957
41J Langwith Junction w/e 09/01/1965
40E Colwick w/e 06/11/1965
36A Doncaster w/e 25/12/1965
   Withdrawn 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 35A New England 05/09/1957
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 6w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 06/11/1965
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 3w/e 01/01/1966
WDN   17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/08/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 92146
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 92146    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath    

prev prev