Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 572 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3715 Week
» 13885 Month
» 291681 Year
» 1176062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92148   30/09/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sun 30/09/1957 to New England (35A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/12/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 8 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
35A New England (New) 30/09/1957
40B Immingham w/e 25/06/1960
34E New England w/e 23/09/1961
36A Doncaster w/e 09/03/1963
40E Colwick w/e 22/06/1963
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 12/09/1964
41J Langwith Junction w/e 09/01/1965
40E Colwick w/e 06/11/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 19/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 35A New England 21/09/1957
ALLOC 40B Immingham 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 34E New England 5w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 6w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   w/e 19/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 92148
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
25/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92148    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev