|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/01/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. | SLS/196102 |
05/05/1962 | Saltley MPD | 46106 Gordon Highlander lost its nameplates on 5th May and together with 46103 went on loan to Leicester Midland whilst 46118 went on loan to Leicester G.C.; 92167 (fitted mechanical stoker) is transferred to Tyne Dock whilst 92165/6 are expected to follow. They did in fact commence the journey on 22nd May but only got as far as Canklow where they were sent back to Saltley. | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/04/1958 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 92165 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Saltley (21A) |
||
23/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bidston (6F) | ||
09/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) | ||
11/11/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
16/03/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 92165 | ||
06/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |