Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 943 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5074 Week
» 15244 Month
» 293040 Year
» 1177421 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92173   28/02/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sun 28/02/1958 to Doncaster (36A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 06/03/1966
Scrapping During 05/1966 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 8 yrs , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
36A Doncaster (New) 28/02/1958
41J Langwith Junction w/e 19/06/1965
40E Colwick w/e 06/11/1965
36A Doncaster w/e 25/12/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 06/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 36A Doncaster 10/02/1958
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 06/11/1965
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 3w/e 01/01/1966
WDN   w/e 06/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/02/1958 To Service To service as BR Number 92173
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Doncaster (36A)
   
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 92173    
05/1966 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev