Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 49 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17852 Week
» 70868 Month
» 190395 Year
» 3217248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92181 |
on |
22/11/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
35A |
|
New England (New) |
on |
22/11/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
21/02/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
35A |
New England |
w/e |
22/11/1957 |
NEW |
91E |
To Eastern Region |
m/e |
30/11/1957 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
on |
03/01/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/02/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/07/1964 |
Derby MPD |
Awaiting Works: D1688. Ex Works: D1749, D1750, D5282/3/4, D5794, 12031/79. Also on 16C. D2859, 92071/158/81/239, 90579/652. Stored: 44172/333, 45585. |
SLS/196408 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/11/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92181 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
21/02/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92181 |
|
|
07/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|