Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2657 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16063 Week
» 69079 Month
» 188606 Year
» 3215459 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92184 |
on |
10/01/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/08/1958 |
Locomotive Miscellany |
C.R.123 with its two C.R. coaches ran from Edinburgh (P.St.) to Carlisle to celebrate the 1888 races, whilst L.N.W.R. Hardwicke was on show at Carlisle station, on 30th August. Class 9F 2-10-0 92184 (35A) hauled the 1-10 p.m. Edinburgh - Kings X between Grantham and London on Saturday, 16th August-load 14 coaches, 462 tons. According to a log it touched 90 m.p.h. at Essendine and 76 m.p.h. at Werrington Junc., 75 m.p.h. at Huntingdon and Hatfield, 74 m.p.h. at Corby Glen and 73 m.p.h. at Holme. |
SLS/195809 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/01/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92184 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
15/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
21/02/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92184 |
|
|
06/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|