Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 4324 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17730 Week
» 70746 Month
» 190273 Year
» 3217126 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92190 |
on |
28/03/1958 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
Standard Class 9F |
Company History |
BR |
Wheels |
2-10-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
Sun 28/03/1958 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/10/1965 |
Service Life |
7 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/10/1965 |
Doncaster Shed (Stationary boiler) |
Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. |
SLS/196511 |
10/12/1965 |
Doncaster MPD |
Stored: 61085, 61135, 61326, 63738, 90203/59/77, 90349/93, 90432/54/76, 90501/16/28, 90629, 92190. |
SLS/196601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/03/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92190 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
02/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
10/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92190 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|