Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 466 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 466 Week
» 17802 Month
» 295598 Year
» 1179979 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92191   30/04/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 30/04/1958 to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/12/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 7 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 30/04/1958
36A Doncaster 5w/e 14/06/1958
40E Colwick w/e 14/09/1963
41J Langwith Junction w/e 16/01/1965
40E Colwick w/e 06/11/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 19/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 41A Sheffield Darnall 15/04/1958
NEW 91E To Eastern Region m/e 30/04/1958
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 40E Colwick 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 06/02/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   w/e 19/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/04/1958 To Service To service as BR Number 92191
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92191    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev