Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 106 Today
» 1187 Yesterday
» 2420 Week
» 13713 Month
» 278346 Year
» 1499911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92198 on 31/10/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 31/10/1958 to Doncaster (36A)
Withdrawal Sun 02/08/1964
Scrapping During 06/1965 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 5 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
36A Doncaster (New) on 31/10/1958
36A Doncaster w/e 20/06/1959
40E Colwick w/e 14/09/1963
36C Frodingham w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn on 02/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 36A Doncaster on 06/10/1958
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 40E Colwick 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 36C Frodingham on 25/11/1963
TOSTORE   3w/e 25/07/1964
WDN   on 02/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/08/1961 Tilbury MPD (33B) On 6th August the following were noted-48431 (81A), 92142 (34E) and 92198 (40B). SLS/196109
25/03/1962 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1958 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92198
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Doncaster (36A)
   
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
02/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 92198    

prev prev