Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 161 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5382 Week
» 20496 Month
» 323686 Year
» 1545251 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92199 on 28/10/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 28/10/1958 to Doncaster (36A)
Withdrawal Sun 02/08/1964
Scrapping During 06/1965 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 5 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
36A Doncaster (New) on 28/10/1958
36C Frodingham w/e 07/02/1959
40E Colwick w/e 14/09/1963
36C Frodingham w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn on 02/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 36A Doncaster on 29/10/1958
ALLOC 40E Colwick 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 36C Frodingham on 25/11/1963
TOSTORE   3w/e 25/07/1964
WDN   on 02/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/01/1962 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/10/1958 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92199
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Doncaster (36A)
   
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
02/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 92199    

prev prev